Ricks, Christina Pechin (CPSO#: 78597)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 01 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008