Rieber, Joanna Charl (CPSO#: 76098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC General Hospital Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
Third Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanna Rieber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rieber ( CPSO# 76098 )

Business Address:
HHSC General Hospital Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
Third Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA CHARL RIEBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIEBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006