Riehl, Christina Kathleen (CPSO#: 109189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primrose Family Medicine Centre
Department of Family Medicine
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone: (613) 230-7788
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Aug 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA KATHLEEN RIEHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIEHL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018