Riesberry, Martha Anne (CPSO#: 97744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 33089
RPO Ira Needles
Waterloo ON  N2N2M9
Phone: 519-603-0724
Fax: 519-603-0725
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martha Riesberry Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Riesberry ( CPSO# 97744 )

Business Address:
PO Box 95
Goderich ON  N7A 3Y5
Phone Number: (519) 612-1202


Corporation Name: Dr. Martha A. Riesberry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Riesberry ( CPSO# 97744 )

Business Address:
P O Box 33089
RPO Ira Needles
Waterloo ON  N2T 2M9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Apr 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA ANNE RIESBERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIESBERRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2014