Rigamonti, Andrea (CPSO#: 83238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Milan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Rigamonti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rigamonti ( CPSO# 83238 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Jul 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Andrea Rigamonti may practise medicine independently in Anaesthesia.