Rihani, Muhamad Raed (CPSO#: 83733)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 06 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rihani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 23 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2008