Rimon Babad, Ayelet (CPSO#: 84027)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2006 to 05 Apr 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2009