Riolo, Giovanna (CPSO#: 88681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5647
Fax: (416) 864-5949
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2525 Old Bronte Road, Room 420
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Canada
Phone: (905) 842-3366
Fax: (905) 842-1180
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Riolo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIOVANNA RIOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIOLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Nov 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012