Riordon, Michele Ann (CPSO#: 92467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit LL4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 721-0040
Fax: (705) 737-2842
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Riordon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Riordon ( CPSO# 92467 )

Business Address:
Suite LL4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 721-0040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE ANN RIORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIORDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Feb 2010 to 26 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2012