Ristoski, Nikolce (CPSO#: 82116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 0
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 10, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 10, 2017, Children’s Hospital of Eastern Ontario (“CHEO”) notified the College of a restriction of Dr. Nikolce Ristoski’s scope of practice to the ambulatory care zone of CHEO's, Emergency Department, with the ability to continue to provide care to children requiring procedural sedation.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKOLCE RISTOSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RISTOSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2005 to 06 Feb 2005
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2006 to 13 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012