Ritsma, Lindsay Rose (CPSO#: 92889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Billett, Lindsay Rose (used until: 02 Jul 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Wellness Services
Student Health
146 Stuart St., LaSalle Building
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L3N6
Phone: 613-533-2506
Fax: 613-533-6740
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Family Medicine
Queens University
220 Bagot St.
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Canada
Phone: 613-533-9300
Fax: 613-544-9899
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ritsma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ritsma ( CPSO# 92889 )
Dr. B. Ritsma ( CPSO# 93713 )

Business Address:
Student Wellness Services
Queens University - LaSalle Building
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2506

Business Address:
752 King Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY ROSE RITSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITSMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012