Riutta, Taylor James (CPSO#: 91125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northwood Downtown Medical Clinic
80 Elm St
Sudbury, ON P3C 1T2
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2
Phone: (705) 522-3380
Fax: (705) 806-7914
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAYLOR JAMES RIUTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIUTTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2012