Riva-Cambrin, Jeremy Johnathon (CPSO#: 96109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Anishnawbe Health Toronto
179 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2E5
Canada
Phone: 4169202605
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Riva-Cambrin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Riva-Cambrin ( CPSO# 96109 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Anishnawbe Health Toronto
179 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 920-2605

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY JOHNATHON RIVA-CAMBRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVA-CAMBRIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2016