Rivington, Jennifer Helen (CPSO#: 61877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 54
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-7765
Fax: (613) 623-0841
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.H. Rivington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rivington ( CPSO# 61877 )

Business Address:
Suite 54
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-7765

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER HELEN RIVINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVINGTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991