Riyaz, Rehan Rahim (CPSO#: 92107)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 28 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 09 May 2011 to 20 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 2012 to 29 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2013