Rizek, Philippe N (CPSO#: 93198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 6858
Fax: 905-813-4229
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

130 Dundas St. East, Suite 404
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V8
Canada
Phone: 905-232-6556
Fax: 905-232-6557
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

North York General Hospital
Genetics, 3rd Fl, South East Wing
4001 Leslie St.
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6345
Fax: (416) 756-6727
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philippe Rizek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rizek ( CPSO# 93198 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Neurology Clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE N RIZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015