Rizkalla, Hoda George (CPSO#: 72841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1719 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1R 2X7
Phone: (416) 444-8404
Fax: (416) 444-4088
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.G. Rizkalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rizkalla ( CPSO# 72841 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1719 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1R 2X7
Phone Number: (416) 444-8404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HODA GEORGE RIZKALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZKALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000