Rizkalla, Michel (CPSO#: 94376)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:All Saints University of Medicine, Aruba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 21 Nov 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2016 to 25 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2016