Rizoli, Sandro Baleotti (CPSO#: 64858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidade Estadual de Campinas, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
3074 Donelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5284
Fax: (416) 864-5281
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandro Rizoli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizoli ( CPSO# 64858 )

Business Address:
1608 Woodbine Heights Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4B 3A4
Phone Number: (416) 864-5616


Corporation Name: Ahmed Marshall Lawless Rizoli de Rezende-Neto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )
Dr. N. Ahmed ( CPSO# 73094 )
Dr. J. Marshall ( CPSO# 30263 )
Dr. S. Rizoli ( CPSO# 64858 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-073 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRO BALEOTTI RIZOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZOLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 May 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2001