Rizvi, Shahbano Hussain (CPSO#: 77995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
243 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone: (613) 968-9934
Fax: (613) 968-9935
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Rizvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizvi ( CPSO# 77995 )

Business Address:
243 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone Number: (613) 968-9934

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHBANO HUSSAIN RIZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008