Rizvi, Syed Mohammad Hussain (CPSO#: 91997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Aug 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Health Centre
Suite 110
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 252-4500
Fax: (519) 252-5600
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette
Department of Psychiatry,
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. X 3223
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Met campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L4
Canada
Phone: 519 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Rizvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizvi ( CPSO# 91997 )

Business Address:
Windsor Health Centre
Suite 110
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone Number: (519) 252-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 May 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Syed  Mohammad  Hussain Rizvi may practise medicine independently in
                  Psychiatry, only.