Rizvi, Syed Naveed Ahmed (CPSO#: 85333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Childrens Hospital
Room B8 166
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55412
Fax: 5196858595
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C P R I
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Canada
Phone: (519) 858-2774 Ext. 2189
Fax: (519) 858-1917
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SNA Rizvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizvi ( CPSO# 85333 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Room B8-166, Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
C P R I
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 719-7560

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED NAVEED AHMED RIZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZVI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014