Roach, Douglas Wilson (CPSO#: 65535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
70 Victoria Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-5841
Fax: (519) 846-8453
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Roach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Roach ( CPSO# 65535 )

Business Address:
70 Victoria Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-5841

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W2
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-2940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS WILSON ROACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993