Robaey, Philippe (CPSO#: 80426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 21 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Brussels, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 738-6990 Ext. 241
Fax: (613) 738-4891
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philippe Robaey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Robaey ( CPSO# 80426 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Suite 200
311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

France

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Mar 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 28 Jan 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE ROBAEY may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF PSYCHIATRY, UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA in which Dr. ROBAEY holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. ROBAEY may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ROBAEY no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. ROBAEY no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. ROBAEY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2004