Robbins, Anthony James (CPSO#: 89783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1415 1st Avenue west
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030 Ext. 215
Fax: (519)370-4055
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Robbins, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Robbins ( CPSO# 89783 )

Business Address:
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY JAMES ROBBINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBBINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010