Roberts, Ashley Dawn (CPSO#: 82833)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Research Fellows - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2010