Robertson, Daniel Kenneth Fraser (CPSO#: 32477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Bayly st west
Ste G-1
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: 905 427-3996
Fax: (905) 619-0438
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

777 simcoe st sth
Oshawa ON  L1H 2G4
Canada
Phone: 9057210003
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

191 simcoe st
Peterborough ON  K9H2H6
Canada
Phone: 7058761000
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

32 simcoe st sth
Oshawa ON  L1H4G2
Canada
Phone: 9057200506
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

2681 egIinton ave east
Scarborough ON  M1K2S2
Canada
Phone: 4162641715
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel K. Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 11 2018

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL KENNETH FRASER ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 15 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2007