Robertson, David Ian (CPSO#: 79274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4159
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

L&A County General Hospital
8 Park Dr., Napanee
Napanee, Ontario
K7R 2Z7
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4159
Fax: (613) 548-2456
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robertson ( CPSO# 79274 )

Business Address:
L & A County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of General Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID IAN ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009