Robertson, Mark William (CPSO#: 97967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 2000 and 3000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark W. Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robertson ( CPSO# 97967 )

Business Address:
Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014