Robertson, Sharman Joanne (CPSO#: 67951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective
Association
875 Carling Ave Ottawa On
K1S 5 P1
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: 613-725-2000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa On
Consulting privileges only
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: 613-882-2865
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON
Consulting privileges only
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharman J. Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Robertson ( CPSO# 67951 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Schizophrenia Program
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARMAN JOANNE ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000