Robins, Ronald Norman (CPSO#: 24883)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road
Suite B2443
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 432-7657
Fax: (519) 432-9887
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. N. Robins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Robins ( CPSO# 81437 )
Dr. R. Robins ( CPSO# 24883 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Suite B2443
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 432-7657

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Medical Records Department 800 Comissioners Rd E London Health Sciences Centre London ON N6A 5W9 and 268 Grosvenor St St. Joesph's Health Care Centre London ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018