Robinson, Anne Michelle (CPSO#: 74760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SLFNHA
Northern Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K8
Phone: (807) 737-5161
Fax: (807) 737-4866
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Robinson ( CPSO# 74760 )

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
PO Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2
Phone Number: (807) 737-5160

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MICHELLE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002