Robinson, Ashley James (CPSO#: 78092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Fax: (416) 813-5789
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
Qatar
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Radiology Effective: 25 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY JAMES ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 07 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010