Robinson, Matthew John (CPSO#: 90234)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2009 to 27 Mar 2009
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 14 Nov 2011 to 23 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2011