Robson, Emily Claire (CPSO#: 93249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-743-2121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily Robson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Robson ( CPSO# 93249 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY CLAIRE ROBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013