Robson, Michael (CPSO#: 27835)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 6668 3rd Line Tottenham ON L0G 1W0
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Robson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 8, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Robson’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Robson failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Robson’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of twelve (12) months.

Dr. Robson will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Robson’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.