Roche, Anne Lynette (CPSO#: 78737)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Sep 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008