Rockwell, Gloria Morene (CPSO#: 71093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 213
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71087
Fax: (613) 739-6948
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

849 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 1X7
Canada
Phone: 6135911099
Fax: 6135911077
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLORIA MORENE ROCKWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCKWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002