Rodgers, Allen Joseph (CPSO#: 30867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5022
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-3555
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLEN JOSEPH RODGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODGERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1988

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: September 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)