Rodin, Danielle Lee (CPSO#: 98171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Michael Rodin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rodin ( CPSO# 98171 )
Dr. G. Rodin ( CPSO# 27164 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychosocial Oncology
and Palliative Care
Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 16-724 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4504

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE LEE RODIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018