Rodrigues, George Boris (CPSO#: 69943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600 Ext. 52833
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Rodrigues Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rodrigues ( CPSO# 69943 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiation Oncology
London Regional Cancer Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE BORIS RODRIGUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001