Rodriguez, Jennifer Mandado (CPSO#: 87634)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cebuano, English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Santos Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 16 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018