Rodwan, Omar Mohamed Abdalla (CPSO#: 84063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 diefenbaker drive
Dr. F. Wigmore Regional Hospital
Moose Jaw SK  S6J 1M5
Phone: (306) 631-2328
Fax: (306) 691-5966
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

105 - 1120 Finch Ave West
healthy way Medical Diagnostic
Centre
Toronto ON  M3J 3H7
Canada
Phone: 416 667 8498
Fax: 416 667 0334
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1664 Dufferin street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Canada
Phone: 416 652 6101
Fax: 416 652 1994
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Rodwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Rodwan ( CPSO# 84063 )

Business Address:
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1

Business Address:
Healthy Way Medical Diagnostic Centre
105 - 1120 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 3H7
Phone Number: (416) 667-8498

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR MOHAMED ABDALLA RODWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2006 to 12 May 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 05 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013