Roehrig, Cintia (CPSO#: 95043)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 16 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2012