Roelfsema, Heather Joanna (CPSO#: 76481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates
Lower Level Suite 100
155 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone: (905) 945-5476
Fax: (905) 945-7707
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Roelfsema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Roelfsema ( CPSO# 76481 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates
Suite 100 Lower Level
155 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone Number: (905) 945-5476

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER JOANNA ROELFSEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROELFSEMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2004