Rogalla, Patrik (CPSO#: 91819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Free University of Berlin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 920 PMH, 3rd Floor
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 2759
Fax: (416) 340-3900
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Patrik Rogalla may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Medical  Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Rogalla  holds  a  geographical   full-time  teaching  or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching  or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate will automatically expire when  Dr.  Rogalla  no  longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.