Rogerson, Sheryle Rosemary (CPSO#: 92494)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Adelaide, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2010 to 16 Apr 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Apr 2010 to 06 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2010