Rogozovsky, Victor (CPSO#: 104878)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2017 to 14 Nov 2017
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2017 to 09 Jan 2018
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2018 to 21 Aug 2018
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2018