Rohani, Kevin Kaveh (CPSO#: 113840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1L8
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN KAVEH ROHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2017 to 17 Nov 2017
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2017 to 12 Jan 2018
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018