Rollings-Scattergood, Jessica Suzanne Nadine (CPSO#: 93531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone: (519) 787-7418
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Rollings-Scattergood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rollings-Scattergood ( CPSO# 93531 )

Business Address:
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-7418

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA SUZANNE NADINE ROLLINGS-SCATTERGOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROLLINGS-SCATTERGOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017